WA SB5787 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state agency and state university medical school electronic health record systems, and the actions of the technology services board related to these systems.
Title
Concerning state agency and state university medical school electronic health record systems, and the actions of the technology services board related to these systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5787&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5787.pdf |