WA SB5778 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting the rights of workers to refrain from attending meetings or listening to their employer's speech on political or religious matters.
Title
Protecting the rights of workers to refrain from attending meetings or listening to their employer's speech on political or religious matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 357, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-20 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-02-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | LC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2023-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1940 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.