WA SB5777 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Improving the business climate in this state by simplifying the administration of municipal general business licenses.
Title
Improving the business climate in this state by simplifying the administration of municipal general business licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-30 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | CLS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 5:45 PM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |