WA SB5735 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging economic development by removing the expiration date from the research and development spending business and occupation tax credit.
Title
Encouraging economic development by removing the expiration date from the research and development spending business and occupation tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-27 | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2012-01-27 | EDTI - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-01-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-30 | Referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. | |
2011-11-30 | And refer to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. | |
2011-11-30 | WM - Majority; without recommendation. | |
2011-11-29 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-18 | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-18 | EDTI - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-16 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development, Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-14 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-09 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5735&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5735.pdf |