WA SB5720 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the involuntary treatment act.
Title
Concerning the involuntary treatment act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020**. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 302, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass without amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-01-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-24 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-01-24 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-01-24 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-28 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-07 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | BH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1814 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.