WA SB5696 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring rural county library district boards in counties with populations of one million five hundred thousand or more to have seven appointed members.
Title
Requiring rural county library district boards in counties with populations of one million five hundred thousand or more to have seven appointed members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-02-24 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 7:45 AM. | |
2009-01-29 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1468 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5696&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5696.pdf |