WA SB5691 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing transparency and accountability regarding prosecutorial filing policies and practices.
Title
Increasing transparency and accountability regarding prosecutorial filing policies and practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | New Code | See Bill Text |