WA SB5688 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Effective date 7/26/2009*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Effective date 7/26/2009*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the rights and responsibilities of state registered domestic partners.
Title
Expanding the rights and responsibilities of state registered domestic partners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | Effective date 7/26/2009*. | |
2009-05-18 | Chapter 521, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-18 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-20 | President signed. | |
2009-04-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 62; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-13 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-04 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-04-04 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-04-04 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-04 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-03-26 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-26 | JUDI - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-26 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-23 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-10 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-10 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-17 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-17 | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-16 | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-16 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-16 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-12 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-05 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-28 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1727 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.