WA SB5684 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revising economic assistance programs by updating standards of need, revising outcome measures and data collected, and reducing barriers to participation.
Title
Revising economic assistance programs by updating standards of need, revising outcome measures and data collected, and reducing barriers to participation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1603 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.