WA HB1603 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revising economic assistance programs by updating standards of need, revising outcome measures and data collected, and reducing barriers to participation.
Title
Revising economic assistance programs by updating standards of need, revising outcome measures and data collected, and reducing barriers to participation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-09 | House | Chapter 343, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 55; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2019-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 69; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5684 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.