WA SB5663 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding derelict and abandoned vessels in state waters.
Title
Regarding derelict and abandoned vessels in state waters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-13 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-03-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass NRP 13 bill proposed by Natural Resources & Parks. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:00 PM. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | NRP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Held on first reading. |