WA SB5647 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing counties to create guardianship courthouse facilitator programs.
Title
Allowing counties to create guardianship courthouse facilitator programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Chapter 295, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2015-04-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-26 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |