WA SB5627 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning salaries for county commissioners and councilmembers.
Title
Concerning salaries for county commissioners and councilmembers.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 49, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-03-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-03-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-03-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-22 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-02 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | LGLT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs. |