WA SB5606 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 1/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 1/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Deterring illegal racing.
Title
Deterring illegal racing.
Sponsors
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2024. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Chapter 283, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-24 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-02 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1631 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 55 | 113 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 55 | 360 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 55 | 370 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 61 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 61 | 530 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |