WA SB5596 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Phasing out use of the valid court order exception to place youth in detention for noncriminal behavior.
Title
Phasing out use of the valid court order exception to place youth in detention for noncriminal behavior.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-20 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |