WA SB5587 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the linked deposit program.
Title
Addressing the linked deposit program.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | FI - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5587&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5587.pdf |