WA SB5576 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing compliance with apprenticeship utilization requirements.
Title
Addressing compliance with apprenticeship utilization requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] |
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 3rd substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Transportation. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 12:00 PM. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1849 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-23 - Effective date 1/1/2020.