WA HB1849 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing compliance with apprenticeship utilization requirements.
Title
Addressing compliance with apprenticeship utilization requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Effective date 1/1/2020. |
2018-03-23 | House | Chapter 244, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2017-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 51; nays, 47; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
Same As/Similar To
SB5576 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.