WA SB5560 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mitigating barriers to patient access to care resulting from health insurance contracting practices.
Title
Mitigating barriers to patient access to care resulting from health insurance contracting practices.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. John McCoy [D] |
Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1471 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-14 - Effective date 1/1/2017.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5560&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5560.pdf |