WA HB1471 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Effective date 1/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Effective date 1/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Mitigating barriers to patient access to care resulting from health insurance contracting practices.
Title
Mitigating barriers to patient access to care resulting from health insurance contracting practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Effective date 1/1/2017. |
2015-05-14 | House | Chapter 251, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2015-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2015-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-09 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-03-09 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-27 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-20 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB5560 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.