WA SB5547 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning nursing pool transparency.
Title
Concerning nursing pool transparency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 100, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-24 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 52c | New Code | See Bill Text | |
18 | 52c | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 52c | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |