WA SB5545 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sustainable recycling.
Title
Concerning sustainable recycling.
Sponsors
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1543 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/1/2019.