WA SB5544 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning affordable housing incentive programs.
Title
Concerning affordable housing incentive programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Darlene Fairley [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. James Kastama [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] |
Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Joe McDermott [D] | Sen. Craig Pridemore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-18 | FIHI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-10 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-26 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1464 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-13 - Effective date 7/26/2009.