WA SB5542 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-16 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-16 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a minimum retirement allowance for members of the law enforcement officers' and firefighters' retirement system plan 2 who were disabled in the line of duty before January 1, 2001.
Title
Providing a minimum retirement allowance for members of the law enforcement officers' and firefighters' retirement system plan 2 who were disabled in the line of duty before January 1, 2001.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | Governor vetoed. | |
2009-04-13 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-09 | President signed. | |
2009-04-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-25 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-25 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-25 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-03-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 7. | |
2009-03-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-26 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1678 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-15 - Effective date 7/26/2009.