WA SB5524 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the duties of industrial insurance self-insured employers and third-party administrators.
Title
Concerning the duties of industrial insurance self-insured employers and third-party administrators.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | LC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1521 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/1/2024.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
51 | 48 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 48 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |