WA SB5516 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the criminal justice training commission firing range maintenance account.
Title
Establishing the criminal justice training commission firing range maintenance account.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM. |
2013-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1613 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-16 - Effective date 7/28/2013.