WA SB5505 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective date 5/12/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective date 5/12/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the use of federal census data to determine the resident population of annexed territory.
Title
Allowing the use of federal census data to determine the resident population of annexed territory.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Effective date 5/12/2011. | |
2011-05-12 | Chapter 342, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-12 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-20 | President signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2011-04-18 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2011-04-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2011-04-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-01 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-15 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-09 | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-09 | LG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-09 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-04 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 9:00 AM. | |
2011-02-26 | First reading, referred to Local Government. | |
2011-02-25 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-02-25 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Floor amendment | |
2011-02-25 | 1st substitute bill not substituted. | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-21 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-21 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-15 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-27 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1336 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.