WA SB5489 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a healthy environment for all by creating a definition of environmental justice, directing agencies to address environmental health disparities, and creating a task force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a healthy environment for all by creating a definition of environmental justice, directing agencies to address environmental health disparities, and creating a task force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-28HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-26HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2019-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-28SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-20SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-19SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-19SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-19SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-13SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:30 AM.
2019-01-23SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback