WA SB5449 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning digital citizenship, media literacy, and internet safety in schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning digital citizenship, media literacy, and internet safety in schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20SenateEffective date 7/23/2017.
2017-04-20SenateChapter 90, 2017 Laws.
2017-04-20SenateGovernor signed.
2017-04-14SenateDelivered to Governor.
2017-04-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-10SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-04-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-04-05HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-03-29HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-03-28HouseED - Majority; do pass.
2017-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Education
2017-03-02SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-02SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-02SenateFloor amendment
2017-03-02Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2017-02-21SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-17SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-02-16SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-16SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-13SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-25SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback