WA SB5448 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning no required psychotropic medication use for students.
Title
Concerning no required psychotropic medication use for students.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] |
Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] |
Roll Calls
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1788 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.