WA SB5430 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the distribution and use of aircraft excise taxes.
Title
Modifying the distribution and use of aircraft excise taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Tracey Eide [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Sen. Nathan Schlicher [D] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2014-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |