WA SB5417 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extending certain privileges granted to liquor licensees to mitigate the impact of the coronavirus pandemic.
Title
Extending certain privileges granted to liquor licensees to mitigate the impact of the coronavirus pandemic.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Commerce & Gaming: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-19 | House | COG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1480 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-14 - Effective date 4/14/2021.
Subjects
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES
BUSINESSES
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
LIQUOR AND CANNABIS BOARD
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
STUDIES
BUSINESSES
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
LIQUOR AND CANNABIS BOARD
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
STUDIES
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
66 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
66 | 24 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 630 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |