WA SB5413 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the pipeline for paraeducators conditional scholarship program.
Title
Concerning the pipeline for paraeducators conditional scholarship program.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:30 PM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |