WA SB5385 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the size of the airport a municipality must control or operate for that municipality to enact minimum labor standards for employees at the airport.
Title
Concerning the size of the airport a municipality must control or operate for that municipality to enact minimum labor standards for employees at the airport.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 106, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-19 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |