WA SB5377 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning funding for infrastructure that supports dense, affordable development in transit-oriented areas.
Title
Concerning funding for infrastructure that supports dense, affordable development in transit-oriented areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Darlene Fairley [D] | Sen. James Kastama [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Christopher Marr [D] |
Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-24 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-24 | EDTI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-02 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-21 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. |