WA SB5354 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-25 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing traffic control in large cities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing traffic control in large cities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-25HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2021-04-02HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM.
2021-03-31HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:00 PM.
2021-03-29HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2021-02-25HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2021-02-23SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-23SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-15SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-11SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2021-02-01SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-26SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4661050Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5354&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5354.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5354%20SBA%20TRAN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5354%20SBR%20TRAN%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5354%20SBR%20TRAN%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5354%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5354%20HBA%20TR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124075&actionText=TRAN%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28603&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124075&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-23-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5354&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback