WA SB5339 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Accommodating the civil rights of religious objectors to mandatory payments to labor organizations.
Title
Accommodating the civil rights of religious objectors to mandatory payments to labor organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules Green Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | CLS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 5:45 PM. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |