WA SB5330 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 5/12/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 5/12/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding commercial whale watching licenses.
Title
Regarding commercial whale watching licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Effective date 5/12/2021. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 284, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-23 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-23 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2021-04-07 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-04-03 | Senate | 1st substitute bill not substituted. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |