WA SB5318 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the office of regulatory assistance.
Title
Addressing the office of regulatory assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-25 | WM - Majority; do pass EDTI 11 bill proposed by Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. | |
2011-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-18 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-18 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-18 | EDTI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-16 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development, Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-14 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development, Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-10 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development, Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-02 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-20 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1178 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-22 - Effective date 6/29/2011.