WA SB5308 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing certain transportation electrification fees on hybrid vehicles.
Title
Reducing certain transportation electrification fees on hybrid vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |