WA SB5302 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an office of the homeowners' association ombuds.
Title
Creating an office of the homeowners' association ombuds.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5302&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5302.pdf |