WA SB5297 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date 7/1/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date 7/1/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Updating and clarifying statutory provisions within the commercial vehicle registration and fuel tax administrative systems.
Title
Updating and clarifying statutory provisions within the commercial vehicle registration and fuel tax administrative systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2015*. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 228, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2015-04-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-03-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-19 | House | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1993 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.