WA HB1993 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Updating and clarifying statutory provisions within the commercial vehicle registration and fuel tax administrative systems.
Title
Updating and clarifying statutory provisions within the commercial vehicle registration and fuel tax administrative systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-04 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-24 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB5297 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-11 - Effective date 7/1/2015*.