WA SB5296 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the liquor and cannabis board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the liquor and cannabis board.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2019-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-20SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM.
2019-02-07SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback