WA SB5286 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-15 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-15 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding exemptions from the WorkFirst program.
Title
Regarding exemptions from the WorkFirst program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-15 | Governor vetoed. | |
2009-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-21 | President signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed final passage; yeas, 41; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-20 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-13 | Vote on third reading will be reconsidered. | |
2009-04-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-13 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-03 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-04-03 | APPH - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-04-03 | APPH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-03 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-04-01 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Health & Human Services Appropriations. | |
2009-03-27 | ELCS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-27 | ELCS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-09 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Children's Services. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-06 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-03 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-12 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-12 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-10 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |