WA SB5267 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain marine cargo from vehicle registrations.
Title
Exempting certain marine cargo from vehicle registrations.
Sponsors
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] |
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |