WA SB5257 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying time frames applicable to certain public disclosure commission requirements.
Title
Modifying time frames applicable to certain public disclosure commission requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Donald Benton [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. Karen Fraser [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-28 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-26 | House | GOE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-03-26 | House | GOE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 9:00 AM. |
2013-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1377 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.