WA SB5248 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the joint legislative task force on jail standards.
Title
Establishing the joint legislative task force on jail standards.
Sponsors
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |