WA SB5239 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the definition of "public facilities."
Title
Modifying the definition of "public facilities."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-02-13 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-13 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-13 | EDTI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-12 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-29 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1450 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.