WA SB5214 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/1/2023**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/1/2023**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning economic assistance programs.
Title
Concerning economic assistance programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Housing, Human Services & Veterans (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Housing, Human Services & Veterans (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2023**. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 239, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 31; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-23 | House | HHSV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 08a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 08a | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 08a | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 08a | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |